Pages 24-26
Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae 1541-1857: Volume 3, Canterbury, Rochester and Winchester Dioceses. Originally published by Institute of Historical Research, London, 1974.
This free content was digitised by double rekeying. All rights reserved.
CANONS OF THE 5TH PREBEND, CANTERBURY
Nicholas Ridley D.D. 1541-1550.
Apptd. by king in foundation charter 8 Apr. 1541 (L. & P. XVI no. 779 (5)). Bp. of Rochester 1547, but royal lic. 16 Nov. to hold this preb. in commendam (C.P.R. 1547-8 p. 65). Bp. of London 1550, and royal lic. 12 Apr. to hold preb. in commendam until Michaelmas 1553 (C.P.R. 1549-51 p. 335), but res. by 15 July 1550 (ibid. p. 293).
Thomas Willoughby M.A. 1550-1554.
Pres. by king 15 July 1550 (C.P.R. 1549-51 p. 293). Instit. by abp. 23 July (Lamb., Reg. Cranmer f. 417v). Depriv. 15 March 1554 (Reg. N ff. 151v-152; C.P.R. 1553-4 p. 330).
John de Feckenham or Howman O.S.B., B.D. 1554.
Pres. by queen 20 June 1554 (C.P.R. 1553-4 p. 330), possibly ineffective.
Ralph Jackson B.D. 1554-1559.
Pres. by king and queen 21 Nov. 1554 (C.P.R. 1554-5 p. 35). Mand. of Nicholas Wotton, guardian of spiritualities sede vacante, for his instal. 24 Nov. (Reg. V1 f. 7v). D. 6 Oct./10 Nov. 1559 (P.R.O., Prob. 11/42B, PCC 53 Chaynay).
Thomas Willoughby M.A. (again) ?-1581.
Occ. 17 Sept. 1560 (Reg. Parker 11 631). D. 23 June/15 Aug. 1581 (Kent County Record Office, DRc/Ac 1 p. 20; Lamb., Reg. Grindal ff. 553v-554; Cal. S.P. Dom. 1581-90 p. 25).
Richard Colfe M.A. 1581-1613.
Pres. by Sir Henry Norris, Lord Norris of Rycote, Oxon., patron hac vice by virtue of queen's gr. of pres. to next preb. of Canterbury in royal gift to fall vac.; instit. by abp. 19 Aug. 1581 (Lamb., Reg. Grindal ff. 553v-554). D. 7 Oct. 1613 (m.i., Canterbury cath.) (Mem. Inscr. Cant. p. 19; Lamb., Reg. Abbot 1 f. 398v). (fn. 1)
William Tunstall M.A. 1613-1622.
Pres. by king 2 Jan. 1604 to next preb. of Canterbury in royal gift to fall vac. (P.R.O., C 66/1611; Cant. Inst. sede vac. p. 25). Instit. by abp. 11 Oct. 1613 (Lamb., Reg. Abbot 1 f. 398v). D. by 6 Nov. 1622 (burial 8 Nov.) (ibid. II f. 330v; Register Booke p. 115).
Isaac Bargrave D.D. 1622-1625.
Pres. by king; instit. by abp. 6 Nov. 1622 (Lamb., Reg. Abbot II f. 330v). Instal. 7 Nov. (AC 1608-28 f. 262). Dean of Canterbury 1625 and res. preb. by 29 Oct. (Lamb., Reg. Abbot II f. 345).
Thomas Paske D.D. 1625-1662.
Pres. by king; instit. by abp. 29 Oct. 1625 (Lamb., Reg. Abbot II f. 345). D. 19 Sept. 1662 (Hertfordshire Record Office, D/P 44 1/1, Much Hadham parish reg.; Cal. S.P. Dom. 1661-2 p. 394).
John Bargrave D.D. 1662-1680.
Petitioned king n.d. 1662 for this preb. (Cal. S.P. Dom. 1661-2 p. 394). Instit. by abp. 26 Sept. (Lamb., Reg. Juxon & Sheldon f. 137v). Abp's mand. instal. s.d. (Reg. 27 f. 285v). D. 11 May 1680 (m.i., Canterbury cath.) (Mem. Inscr. Cant. p. 83; Lamb., Reg. Sancroft ff. 384v-385).
George Thorpe D.D. 1680-1719.
Warrant for pres. by king 12 May 1680 (Cal. S.P. Dom. 1679-80 p. 472); pres. issued 20 May (Reg. 28 f. 391v). Instit. by abp. 22 May (Lamb., Reg. Sancroft ff. 384v-385). Instal. by proxy 26 May (AC 1670-1710 f. 58). D. 21 Nov. 1719 (Hist. Reg. Chron. 1719, iv 41; Lamb., Reg. Wake 1 f. 308).
John Hancock D.D. 1719-1728.
Pres. by king 30 Nov. 1719 (Hist. Reg. Chron. 1719, iv 41). Instit. by abp. 10 Dec. (Lamb., Reg. Wake 1 f. 308). Instal. 14 Dec. (AC 1711-26 f. 85). D. 21 June 1728 (Hist. Reg. Chron. 1728, xiii 34; Lamb., Reg. Wake II f. 246v).
John Harris D.D. 1728-1738.
Pres. by king pubd. 15 July 1728; pres. issued 17 July (Lond. Gaz. no. 6691; P.R.O., C 66/3575). Instit. by abp. 30 July (Lamb., Reg. Wake 11 f. 246v). Instal. 2 Aug. (AC 1727-46 f. 23v). Bp. of Llandaff 1729, but held preb. in commendam to d. 28 Aug. 1738 (Gent. Mag. 1738, viii 490; Lamb., Reg. Potter f. 270).
Thomas Tenison LL.D. 1739-1742.
Pres. by king issued 8 Feb. 1739 (P.R.O., C 66/3599). Instit. by abp. s.d. (Lamb., Reg. Potter f. 270). Pres. by king pubd. 10 Feb. (Lond. Gaz. no. 7778). Instal. s.d. (AC 1727-46 ff. 144v-145). D. 7 May 1742 (Gent. Mag. 1742, xii 274; Lond. Gaz. no. 8122).
Hon. Spencer Cowper M.A. 1742-1746.
Pres. by king issued 21 May 1742; pubd. 29 May (P.R.O., C 66/3608; Lond. Gaz. no. 8122). Instal. 19 June (AC 1727-46 f. 179). Dean of Durham 1746 and res. preb. by 14 June (Lond. Gaz. no. 8547).
Arthur Young LL.D. 1746-1759.
Pres. by king pubd. 14 June 1746 (Lond. Gaz. no. 8547). Instit. by abp. 27 June (Lamb., Reg. Potter f. 295v). Instal. 28 June (AC 1727-46 f. 239). D. 29 June 1759 (Gent. Mag. 1759, xxix 346; Lamb., Reg. Secker f. 294).
John Head D.D. 1759-1769.
Pres. by king 14 July 1759 (P.R.O., C 66/3665). Instit. by abp. 16 July (Lamb., Reg. Secker f. 294). Instal. 17 July (AC 1746-60 f. 155). Succeeded to baronetcy 1768 (Complete Baronetage IV 76-7). D. 4 Dec. 1769 (Gent. Mag. 1769, xxxix 608; Lamb., Reg. Cornwallis f. 407).
Richard Palmer M.A. 1769-1781.
Pres. by king; instit. by abp. 21 Dec. 1769 (Lamb., Reg. Cornwallis f. 407). Instal. 23 Dec. (AC 1761-75 pp. 222-3). Res. by 27 Apr. 1781 (Lamb., Reg. Cornwallis f. 452r-v).
John Lynch D.C.L. 1781-1803.
Pres. by king pubd. 7 Apr. 1781 (Lond. Gaz. no. 12176). Instit. by abp. 27 Apr. (Lamb., Reg. Cornwallis f. 452r-v). Instal. 28 Apr. (AC 1775-93 p. 136). D. 1 May 1803 (Gent. Mag. 1803, lxxiii (1) 485; Lamb., Reg. Moore ff. 571v-572).
William Nelson D.D. 1803-1835.
Pres. by king pubd. 24 May 1803 (Lond. Gaz. no. 15586). Instit. by abp. 31 May (Lamb., Reg. Moore ff. 571v-572). Instal. 4 June (AC 1794-1824 pp. 120-1). Succeeded as Baron Nelson of the Nile 1805; created Viscount Merton and Earl Nelson of Trafalgar 1805 ((Complete Peerage IX 464). D. 28 Feb. 1835 (Gent. Mag. 1835, cv (2) 541; Lamb., Reg. Howley p. 752). (fn. 2)
Frederick Vernon Lockwood M.A. 1838-1851.
Pres. by queen pubd. 3 Nov. 1838 (Lond. Gaz. no. 19670). Instit. by abp. 16 Nov. (Lamb., Reg. Howley p. 752). Instal. 17 Nov. (AC 1824-54 pp. 258-9). D. 1 July 1851 (Gent. Mag. 1851, cxxix (2) 215; Lamb., Reg. Sumner p. 579).
Arthur Penrhyn Stanley M.A. 1851-1858.
Pres. by queen pubd. 14 July 1851 (Lond. Gaz. no. 21227). Instit. by abp. 9 Aug. (Lamb., Reg. Sumner p. 579). Instal. 16 Aug. (AC 1824-54 p. 463). Res. by 23 Apr. 1858 on becoming canon of Christ Church, Oxford, and successor apptd. (Lamb., Reg. Sumner p. 619).